This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/11/2021 at 00:04:22 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC vs. BARLOW, KAREN

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARLOW, KAREN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SP

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

Defendant

BARLOW, KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH C

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2/27/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT

2/27/2020: FOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT

PAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2020020790

2/27/2020: PAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2020020790

NOTICE @

2/27/2020: NOTICE @

PAYMENT $187.75 RECEIPT #2020029968

3/18/2020: PAYMENT $187.75 RECEIPT #2020029968

REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT FOR KAREN BARLOW

3/3/2020: REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT FOR KAREN BARLOW

MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/12/2020: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

11/12/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020088565

11/12/2020: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020088565

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

11/24/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT DISMISSAL

12/18/2020: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT PAYMENT IN FULL PER FOREIGN JUDGEMENT AND DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020088565

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $187.75 RECEIPT #2020029968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT FOR KAREN BARLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE @

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2020020790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/27/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 000844 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C