This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/11/2022 at 17:09:22 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB vs. SUAREZ, ANGEL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SUAREZ, ANGEL. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 MF

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

Defendants

SUAREZ, ANGEL

RODRIGUEZ, GENITA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGEL SUAREZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GENITA RODRIGUEZ

DISCOVER BANK

ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC.

POINCIANA VILLAGE FIVE ASSOCIATION INC.

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELANEY, SUZANNE V.

 

Court Documents

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

7/13/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

7/13/2022: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNKNOWN SPOUSES OF ANGEL SUAREZ GENITA RODRIGUEZ NKA GENITA SUAREZ; UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 7/28/2022@610PM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 726/2022@128PM PARTY SERVED: DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF PROMISSORY NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/13/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001842 MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POINCIANA VILLAGE TWO ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant