Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 05/15/2021 at 17:18:09 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE NRPL TRUST 2019-3 MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES SERIES 2019-3 vs. MARRERO, MANUEL E

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE NRPL TRUST 2019-3 MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES SERIES 2019-3 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARRERO, MANUEL E. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 MF

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE NRPL TRUST 2019-3 MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES SERIES 2019-3

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

KISSIMMEE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

MARRERO, ROSARIO

MELENDEZ, BANY

MARRERO, MANUEL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE REGARDING MAILING OF NOTICES PURSUANT TO SECTION 49.12 FS

4/27/2021: CERTIFICATE REGARDING MAILING OF NOTICES PURSUANT TO SECTION 49.12 FS

NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 8TH JUNE 2021 FROM BANY MELENDEZ (EMAILED COPY TO GAZETTE FOR PUBLICATION)

4/27/2021: NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 8TH JUNE 2021 FROM BANY MELENDEZ (EMAILED COPY TO GAZETTE FOR PUBLICATION)

DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION

4/27/2021: DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION

DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION

4/21/2021: DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

4/6/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

4/5/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

4/5/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 03/25/2021@1055AM PARTY SERVED: KISSIMMEE BY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

4/5/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 03/25/2021@1055AM PARTY SERVED: KISSIMMEE BY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 3/29/2021@635PM PARTY SERVED: ROSARIO MARRERO

4/5/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 3/29/2021@635PM PARTY SERVED: ROSARIO MARRERO

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 3/29/2021@635PM PARTY SERVED: MANUEL E MARRERO

4/5/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 3/29/2021@635PM PARTY SERVED: MANUEL E MARRERO

ANSWER FROM KISSIMMEE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

3/31/2021: ANSWER FROM KISSIMMEE BAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

3/16/2021: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

3/16/2021: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

FORM A

3/16/2021: FORM A

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

3/16/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE REGARDING MAILING OF NOTICES PURSUANT TO SECTION 49.12 FS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 8TH JUNE 2021 FROM BANY MELENDEZ (EMAILED COPY TO GAZETTE FOR PUBLICATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ON DEFENDANT BANY MELENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR BANY MELENDEZ (NOT ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/19/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000797 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS, SARA