This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/29/2021 at 13:16:29 (UTC).

WESTGATE VACATION VILLAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. POLLINGER, AUDRA

Case Summary

On 01/29/2015 WESTGATE VACATION VILLAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against POLLINGER, AUDRA. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLODNA, SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 MF

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLODNA, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTGATE VACATION VILLAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

WARREN, CHARITY H.

SCHAFER, SETON C.

DONALD, ASHLEY MARK

BURDA, YALON M.

MOHR, ELISABETE R.

PAYNE, ZOLA

PAYNE, SR., CHARLES A.

PAYNE, JR., CHARLES A.

DONALD, ARDEAN MARGARET

DIAZ, JUAN

FOREMAN, NANCY J.

FOREMAN, ROBERT

DIAZ, MARTHA

POLLINGER, AUDRA

BURDA, LAWRENCE F.

JACKSON, CATHERINE S.

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

10/6/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

9/10/2015: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

ASSIGNMENT OF BID

9/9/2015: ASSIGNMENT OF BID

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

7/17/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

7/17/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

7/17/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 6/8/15 (COPY OF NOTICE & COMPLAINT MAILED TO EACH DEFENDANT AS LISTED)

4/29/2015: NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 6/8/15 (COPY OF NOTICE & COMPLAINT MAILED TO EACH DEFENDANT AS LISTED)

INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK

4/14/2015: INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

4/14/2015: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

4/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

4/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

4/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

4/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

4/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

4/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT- 04/14- DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CATHERINE S. JACKSON; SETON C. SCHAFER

4/13/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT- 04/14- DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CATHERINE S. JACKSON; SETON C. SCHAFER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( REC )

2/24/2015: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( REC )

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

2/3/2015: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ASSIGNMENT OF BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • HearingEvent: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALES; Location: ROOM 2600 SUITE 2602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2015109801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( REC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE LIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1,205.00 RECEIPT #2015014334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/29/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 000240 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTGATE VACATION VILLAS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant