This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 12/21/2020 at 06:35:32 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs. ROMERO, LUZ

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROMERO, LUZ. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 MF

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELIN Z MEJIA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUZ ROMERO

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ROMERO, LUZ

HOUSE FINANCE CORPORATION III

MEJIA, MELINZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REIDER, DAVID L

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY

8/23/2018: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/21/2018@750PM PARTY SERVED: MELIN Z MEJIA

6/26/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/21/2018@750PM PARTY SERVED: MELIN Z MEJIA

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/21/2018@750PM PARTY SERVED: MELIN Z MEJIA

6/25/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/21/2018@750PM PARTY SERVED: MELIN Z MEJIA

PROOF OF PAYMENT

6/19/2018: PROOF OF PAYMENT

PAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2018058248

6/14/2018: PAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2018058248

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

6/12/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/7/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/7/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

6/7/2018: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND TO DISMISS ACTION

8/16/2018: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND TO DISMISS ACTION

MOTION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

8/6/2018: MOTION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELIN Z MEJIA

6/26/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELIN Z MEJIA

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUZ ROMERO

6/26/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUZ ROMERO

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/7/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/7/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/7/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

6/7/2018: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

6/7/2018: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE AND ORIGINAL MODIFICATION OF MORTGAGE PER ORDER @

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND TO DISMISS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION AND REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER GOVERNINGFORECLOSE MEDIATION PROCEDURES OSCEOLA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/07/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CA 001846 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reider, David L