This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/12/2023 at 18:04:35 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA vs. RAMOS, WILFREDO

Case Summary

On 10/12/2010 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RAMOS, WILFREDO. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POLODNA, SCOTT, MILLER, JEFFORDS, LEGENDRE, RONALD A and FORECLOSURE SENIOR JUDGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 MF

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POLODNA, SCOTT

MILLER, JEFFORDS

LEGENDRE, RONALD A

FORECLOSURE SENIOR JUDGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

Defendants

TENANT #2

TENANT #3

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

LAKESIDE ESTATES MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

TENANT #4

TENANT #1

RAMOS, WILFREDO

RAMOS, MILAGROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVANOV, IVAN D.

Defendant Attorney

BLEIL, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

10/12/2010: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/12/2010: CIVIL COVER SHEET

BORROWER'S REQUEST TO NOT PARTICIPATE IN RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE MEDIATION PROGRAM (RMFM) (BC)

11/15/2010: BORROWER'S REQUEST TO NOT PARTICIPATE IN RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE MEDIATION PROGRAM (RMFM) (BC)

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 11/10/10 PARTY SERVED: WILFREDO RAMOS

11/22/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 11/10/10 PARTY SERVED: WILFREDO RAMOS

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 11/10/10 PARTY SERVED: MILAGRO RAMOS

11/22/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 11/10/10 PARTY SERVED: MILAGRO RAMOS

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 11/1/10 PARTY SERVED: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CHASE MANHATTAN BAMK AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

11/22/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 11/1/10 PARTY SERVED: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CHASE MANHATTAN BAMK AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 11/12/10 PARTY SERVED: LAKESIDE ESTATES MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

11/22/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 11/12/10 PARTY SERVED: LAKESIDE ESTATES MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/29/2010: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR TENANT #2 (DEFENDANT);

12/1/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR TENANT #2 (DEFENDANT);

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: WILFREDO RAMOS & MILAGROS RAMOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketEntry: TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: WILFREDO RAMOS & MILAGROS RAMOS / NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS (SURPLUS $11,184.18)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketEntry: LETTER TO HOMEOWNERS FROM "RMFM PROGRAM"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 150292; Applied Amount: $975.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 150292; Applied Amount: $975.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 150292; Applied Amount: $975.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketEntry: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE ADDTL DEFENDANTS RECEIPT: 150292 DATE: 10/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketEntry: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RECEIPT: 150292 DATE: 10/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • DocketEntry: MTG FORECLOSURE $50,001 TO $250,000 RECEIPT: 150292 DATE: 10/13/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKESIDE ESTATES MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bleil, Joshua Adam