This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 10:35:20 (UTC).

VEECO INSTRUMENTS, INC. vs. RHODY, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 VEECO INSTRUMENTS, INC filed an Other lawsuit against RHODY, KEVIN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 CL

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEECO INSTRUMENTS, INC.

Defendant

RHODY, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORD, RICHARDS H. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

INFURNA, JUSTIN R

 

Court Documents

APPELANT'S INITIAL BRIEF

11/13/2019: APPELANT'S INITIAL BRIEF

PAYMENT $74.00 RECEIPT #2019106119

10/31/2019: PAYMENT $74.00 RECEIPT #2019106119

INDEX TO APPEAL

10/11/2019: INDEX TO APPEAL

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

8/16/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

NOTICE OF FILING

3/26/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 2/1/19

1/31/2019: DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 2/1/19

MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERK

1/31/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT CLERK

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018063490

6/29/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018063490

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2018061447

6/25/2018: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2018061447

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/31/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILING OF NEW APPEAL/2019 AP 22 AP

8/23/2019: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILING OF NEW APPEAL/2019 AP 22 AP

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

6/20/2019: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED

AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.5529.57. / 2019066638)

5/23/2019: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.5529.57. / 2019066638)

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

4/3/2019: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT (NO CLERK'S DEFAULT FORM ATTACHED/ NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED)

1/15/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT (NO CLERK'S DEFAULT FORM ATTACHED/ NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED)

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE THROUGH ALTERNATE MEANS

1/15/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE THROUGH ALTERNATE MEANS

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/6/2018: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/29/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: APPELANT'S INITIAL BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $74.00 RECEIPT #2019106119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: LETTER WITH 74 DOLLAR MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INDEX TO APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $281.00 RECEIPT #2019084656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILING OF NEW APPEAL/2019 AP 22 AP

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR KEVIN RHODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE AND MOTION TO EFFECT SERVICE THROUGH ALTERNATIVE MEANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE AND MOTION TO EFFECT SERVICE THROUGH ALTERNATIVE MEANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018063490

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF THROUGH WINDOW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2018061447

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/22/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CC 001677 CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veeco Instruments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORD, RICHARDS HUFF