This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/30/2021 at 05:46:00 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NA vs. SANTIAGO, JULIO

Case Summary

On 03/03/2015 U S BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SANTIAGO, JULIO. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WEISS, KEVIN B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 MF

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WEISS, KEVIN B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NA

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY #2

SANTIAGO, JULIO

ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

POINCIANA VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTY #1

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

UNKNOWN PARTY #4

MIRANDA, MARIA

POINCIANA VILLAGE TWO ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTY #3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, BRANDI

Defendant Attorney

CALZADA, RICARDO

 

Court Documents

JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PRIJUDICE

2/11/2016: JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PRIJUDICE

REQUEST FOR FOR PRODUCTION OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT JULIO SANTIAGO

9/14/2015: REQUEST FOR FOR PRODUCTION OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT JULIO SANTIAGO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/14/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE

5/14/2015: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING DISCOVERY REQUEST UPON DEFENDANT JULIO SANTIAGO

4/30/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING DISCOVERY REQUEST UPON DEFENDANT JULIO SANTIAGO

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

4/2/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 3/16/2015 PARTY SERVED: POINCIANA VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

4/2/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 3/16/2015 PARTY SERVED: POINCIANA VILLAGE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 3/6/2015 PARTY SERVED: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

4/2/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 3/6/2015 PARTY SERVED: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 3/17/2015 PARTY SERVED: MARIA MIRANDA

4/2/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 3/17/2015 PARTY SERVED: MARIA MIRANDA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/24/2015: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PAPER

3/24/2015: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PAPER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

3/23/2015: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

BALANCE DUE LETTER SENT TO ATTORNEY

3/12/2015: BALANCE DUE LETTER SENT TO ATTORNEY

PAYMENT $1,002.50 RECEIPT #2015030771

3/5/2015: PAYMENT $1,002.50 RECEIPT #2015030771

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

3/4/2015: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/3/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/3/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

FORM A

3/3/2015: FORM A

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PRIJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • HearingEvent: NON JURY TRIAL; Judge: FORECLOSURE SENIOR JUDGE; Location: COURTROOM 5D; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OCT 7 2015 / 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUATION OF NON JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 28 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUATION OF NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 28, 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUATION OF NON-JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 28, 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUATION OF NON JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 28 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/03/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 000529 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POINCIANA VILLAGE TWO ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant