This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/11/2023 at 17:19:01 (UTC).

TRICIA JENKINS vs. CIRCLE K STORES INC FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 TRICIA JENKINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES INC FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVARO, CHAD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 AN

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVARO, CHAD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRICIA JENKINS

Defendants

CIRCLE K STORES INC FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION

TORITOM SERVICES INC A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRESSER, JUSTIN H

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, JENNIFER ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/10/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/10/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/10/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

1/10/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

1/10/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

1/10/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

1/10/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

1/10/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

1/10/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

1/10/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

1/10/2023: NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

1/10/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023003941

1/12/2023: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023003941

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

1/23/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023003941; Applied Amount: $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023003941

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT TORITOM SERVICES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CIRCLE K STORES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/10/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 000042 AN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less