This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 07/08/2023 at 09:23:47 (UTC).

TRAMEL, JASON vs OLD, MEGHAN

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 TRAMEL, JASON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against OLD, MEGHAN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, CHRISTY C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 PA

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, CHRISTY C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRAMEL, JASON

Respondent

OLD, MEGHAN

Not Yet Classified

T, S E R

T, T W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOURNE, J CRAIG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/18/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR MEGHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketEntry: ANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022

DocketEntry: ANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND OTHER RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR RESPONDENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

FinancialReceipt Number: 2022072200; Applied Amount: $45.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $45.00 RECEIPT #2022072200

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

FinancialReceipt Number: 2022069131; Applied Amount: $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022069131

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/25/2022

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/25/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 DR 002856 PA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR JASON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR JASON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2022

DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less