Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 06/25/2021 at 22:04:51 (UTC).

TOWN POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. ESTATE OF RAMLAL RATTAN\DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 TOWN POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ESTATE OF RAMLAL RATTAN DECEASED. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 MF

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWN POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ESTATE OF RAMLAL RATTAN\DECEASED

SAMD, HARDAI

ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

CACH LLC

RATTAN, CHANDROUTIE

BEETAN, CHRISENDAYE A

DOVE INFESTMENT CORP

RATTAN, HECTOR

RATTAN NAWBATT, INDIRA

POINCIANA VILLAGE ONE ASSOCIATION INC

RATTAN, RICHARD

RATTAN, SOOKOORMONIE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 & 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER, BRIAN L. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

SHAFRITZ, HUGH

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021057403

6/25/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021057403

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/23/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/15/2021@1104AM PARTY SERVED: ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

6/21/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/15/2021@1104AM PARTY SERVED: ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/11/2021@12PM PARTY SERVED: CACH LLC

6/21/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/11/2021@12PM PARTY SERVED: CACH LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/15/2021@1240PM PARTY SERVED: INDIRA RATTAN NAWBATT

6/21/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/15/2021@1240PM PARTY SERVED: INDIRA RATTAN NAWBATT

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

5/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/28/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

5/28/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

5/28/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021057403; Applied Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021057403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT DOVE INVESTMENT CORP ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE AND MOTION TO PARTICIPATE IN SURPLUS PROCEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/15/2021@1104AM PARTY SERVED: ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/11/2021@12PM PARTY SERVED: CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 6/14/2021@1057AM PARTY SERVED: DOVE INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 6/15/2021@1240PM PARTY SERVED: INDIRA RATTAN NAWBATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021049936; Applied Amount: $1,080.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/28/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 001568 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOVE INVESTMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where POINCIANA VILLAGE TWO ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant