This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/22/2023 at 03:10:44 (UTC).

TORRES, MELISSA ELAINE vs. CALATLANTIC GROUP, LLC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE FORMER CALATRANTIC GROUP, INC., WHICH WAS THE SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE RYLAND GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 TORRES, MELISSA ELAINE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CALATLANTIC GROUP, LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE FORMER CALATRANTIC GROUP, INC , WHICH WAS THE SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE RYLAND GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVARO, CHAD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 ON

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVARO, CHAD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES, MELISSA ELAINE

Defendant

CALATLANTIC GROUP, LLC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE FORMER CALATRANTIC GROUP, INC., WHICH WAS THE SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE RYLAND GROUP, INC.

3Rd Party Defendants

A&B STUCCO INC

TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

3Rd Party Plaintiff

CALATLANTIC GROUP LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE FORMER CALATLANTIC GROUP INC WHICH WAS THE SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO THE RYLAND GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'BRIEN, NEIL P ESQ

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

CHAABAN, DANA

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

KAPSALES, PETER J

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/11/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/11/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/11/2022: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

8/15/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022075489

8/16/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022075489

COUNTERCLAIM FILED CALATANTIC GROUP LLC ANSWER DEFENSES AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

9/7/2022: COUNTERCLAIM FILED CALATANTIC GROUP LLC ANSWER DEFENSES AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/9/2022: THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CALATLANTIC GROUP LLC THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 09/26/2022 @ 11:35AM PARTY SERVED: CALATLANTIC GROUP, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 9/22/22 PARTY SERVED: A & B STUCCO, INC. C/O RA: MAURO B. BRANCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022084008; Applied Amount: $415.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $415.00 RECEIPT #2022084008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF MELISSA ELAINE TORRES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT THRID PARTY PLAITNIFF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF MELISSA ELAINE TORRES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COUNTERCLAIM FILED CALATANTIC GROUP LLC ANSWER DEFENSES AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 8/18/22 PARTY SERVED: CATATLANTIC GROUP, LLC. C/O CORPORATE CREATIONS NETWORK AS RA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022075489; Applied Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022075489

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/12/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002100 ON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less