Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 17:40:58 (UTC).

THE TRANSITION HOUSE INC vs. O'CONNOR, KENDRICK

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 THE TRANSITION HOUSE INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against O'CONNOR, KENDRICK. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TRANSITION HOUSE INC

Defendants

O'CONNOR, KENDRICK

O'CONNER, SHEZWAE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/23/17

2/27/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/23/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

2/20/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

2/14/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

2/14/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/23/16 PARTY SERVED: KENDRICK OCONNOR

1/26/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/23/16 PARTY SERVED: KENDRICK OCONNOR

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/23/16 PARTY SERVED: SHEZWAE OCONNOR

1/26/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/23/16 PARTY SERVED: SHEZWAE OCONNOR

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/17/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

OWNERS AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER TO BRING EVICTION ACTION

1/17/2017: OWNERS AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER TO BRING EVICTION ACTION

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

1/17/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/17/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/17/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2017005352

1/17/2017: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2017005352

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017005347

1/17/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017005347

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: .ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/23/16 PARTY SERVED: KENDRICK OCONNOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/23/16 PARTY SERVED: SHEZWAE OCONNOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: OWNERS AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER TO BRING EVICTION ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2017005352

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017005347

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/17/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000110 EV

    Read MoreRead Less