Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 18:40:26 (UTC).

THE LAW GROUP HOLDINGS LLC vs. AVILA ARAUJO, OLGA LORENA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 THE LAW GROUP HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against AVILA ARAUJO, OLGA LORENA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE LAW GROUP HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

QUINONES CORREA, CESAR ALBERTO

AVILA ARAUJO, OLGA LORENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCABE, WILLIAM J.

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

4/3/2017: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, UNSERVED (CXL)

3/28/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, UNSERVED (CXL)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

3/20/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

AFFIDAVIT FOR NON-PAYMENT

3/13/2017: AFFIDAVIT FOR NON-PAYMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED:1/24/17 PARTY SERVED: OLGA LORENA AVILA

1/26/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED:1/24/17 PARTY SERVED: OLGA LORENA AVILA

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/24/17 PARTY SERVED: CESAR ALBERTO QUINONES CORREA

1/26/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/24/17 PARTY SERVED: CESAR ALBERTO QUINONES CORREA

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/24/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017007637

1/23/2017: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017007637

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

1/20/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/20/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/20/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/20/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/20/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, UNSERVED (CXL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT FOR NON-PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/24/17 PARTY SERVED: CESAR ALBERTO QUINONES CORREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017007637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/20/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000149 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCABE WILLIAM J