This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 11/21/2020 at 17:05:26 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF vs. NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONAL FIRE MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC DBA AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF

Defendant

NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, ROBERT F

Defendant Attorneys

MCGRISKIN, MICHAEL A ESQ

TILKA, KATHERINE E

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/16/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION FROM DEFENDANT

10/19/2020: REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION FROM DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/6/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

10/2/2020: REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074906

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074906

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRSTREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/22/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRSTREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERRATORIES TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/22/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERRATORIES TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 B 1 A

9/22/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 B 1 A

PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

9/22/2020: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

$8000.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/22/2020: $8000.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FWD TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020074906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003803 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRSTREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERRATORIES TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 B 1 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $8000.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less