Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 17:28:35 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: ZUVICH, HELEN

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 THE ESTATE OF ZUVICH, HELEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

ZUVICH, RICHARD ALLEN

ZUVICH, NICHOLAS JR

ZUVICH, CRAIG

ZUVICH, KENNETH

MINISCI, CHRISTINE A

Decedent

ZUVICH, HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEBB, HEIDI S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2018068784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 6/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT. SIGNED BY: NICHOLAS ZUVICH, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT. SIGNED BY: CHRISTINE MINISCI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT. SIGNED BY: KENNETH ZUVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT. SIGNED BY: CRAIG ZUVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018042889

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/30/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000310 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBB , HEIDI S