Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 08:13:12 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: WOLOSZYN, NANCY L

Case Summary

On 03/28/2018 THE ESTATE OF WOLOSZYN, NANCY L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 PR

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

WHITE, LEWIS FRED JR

Not Yet Classified

WOLOSZYN, JOHN

WHITE, TERRY

WHITE, LEWIS FRED JR

SANDER, MARY

Decedent

WOLOSZYN, NANCY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MASSEY, LEE H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2018056007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT- DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST MARY SANDER ON MAY 31, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT, WAIVER AND JOINDER TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT, WAIVER AND JOINDER TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018032498

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/29/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000236 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASSEY, LEE H