Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 16:48:38 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: WILSON, HARRIET LARKIN

Case Summary

On 04/25/2018 THE ESTATE OF WILSON, HARRIET LARKIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

RYDER, LINDA S

WILSON, BRUCE L

Decedent

WILSON, HARRIET LARKIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BONDY, JENNIFER R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 9/7/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE;RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE. SIGNED BY: BRUCE WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE;RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE. SIGNED BY: LINDA S. RYDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - REC

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/26/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000297 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - BRUCE LEE WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - LINDA S. RYDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - BRUCE LEE WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITH THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONDY, JENNIFER R