Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 14:13:08 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: VORE, JERRY

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 THE ESTATE OF VORE, JERRY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAFOND, PAULA

Decedent

VORE, JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON, PATRICK J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2018082533

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL UP WITH JUDGE AS OF 8/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2018066198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF TESTATE ESTATE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: AMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMN. SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 6/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 6/4/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF TESTATE ESTATE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $365.00 RECEIPT #2018039706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/19/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000280 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less