This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:42:55 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: STONE, KATIE MAE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 THE ESTATE OF STONE, KATIE MAE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 PR

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GREENE, BONNIE STONE

Decedent

STONE, KATIE MAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

GLAVIN, GRACE ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION; Judge: MURPHY, MICHAEL; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.5782.356. / 2020113347)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING CERTIFIED COPY OF WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - RECORDED (OR.5782.353. / 2020113344)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDERS AND LETTER WITH JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER ADMITTING CERTIFIED COPY OF WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (DUBLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER ADMITTING CERTIFIED COPY OF WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERT. MAIL RET/SIGNED-GREENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/NOTICE OF HEARING - RECORDED (OR.5742.44. / 2020080415)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION SET FOR 10/19/2020 AT 11:00 AM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: MURPHY, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: AUTHENTICATED COPIES DOMICILARY PROCEEDINGS - RECORDED (OR.5460.1219. / 2019003046)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: AUTHENTICATED COPIES DOMICILARY PROCEEDINGS - RECORDED (OR.5460.1202. / 2019003043)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019001352

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING/ DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT, AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.5458.322. / 2019000772)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CP 000003 PR

    Read MoreRead Less