Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 11:40:27 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: STALEY, JAMES RICHARD

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 THE ESTATE OF STALEY, JAMES RICHARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

STALEY, LAURA

Not Yet Classified

STALEY, ADAM G

STALEY, LAURA

STALEY, JAMES R

Decedent

STALEY, JAMES RICHARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMIN W/JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 6/7/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: DISCLAIMER OF REMAINDER INTEREST IN REAL PROPERTY. SIGNED BY: JAMES R. STALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018036850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/11/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000261 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less