Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 21:25:49 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: PEREZ, PAULA O

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 THE ESTATE OF PEREZ, PAULA O was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 PR

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

LEBRON, EDGARDO

LEBRON, AIRY

LEBRON, RAIMUNDO

Decedent

PEREZ, PAULA O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTINI, PAMELA GRACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.5519.1037. / 2019057843)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE WITH JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER)-EDGARDO LEBRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF PETITION DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER) -AIRY LEBRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE (FULL WAIVER)-RAIMUNDO LEBRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018046706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/09/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000328 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND. SIGNED BY: AIRY LEBRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND. SIGNED BY: RAIMUNDO LEBRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER FROM THE ORLANDO LAW GROUP, PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINI PAMELA GRACE