Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 15:07:16 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: PAYTON, KENNETH LEE J

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 THE ESTATE OF PAYTON, KENNETH LEE J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAYTON, KENNETH LEE S

Decedent

PAYTON, KENNETH LEE J

Not Yet Classified

TINDELL, MARGEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DORN, CELIA THACKER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021036763; Applied Amount: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021036763

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: .P3 WAIVED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT # 2021033520 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES MOTION TO DISMISS - RECORDED (OR.5935.39. / 2021056082)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021033520; Applied Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES:PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER GRANTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021033520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: ORDER BELOW NOT SENT//DUPLICATE CASE//SEE 2021CP267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND. SIGNED BY: MARGEAN TINDELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.5932.868. / 2021053985)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000290 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORN, CELIA THACKER