Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 04:10:30 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: MONROE, SHERADI DAUN

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 THE ESTATE OF MONROE, SHERADI DAUN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 PR

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

MONROE, DEREK

Decedent

MONROE, SHERADI DAUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent, Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

ISBEL, CHRISTOPHER C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION; Judge: MURPHY, MICHAEL; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER EXTENDING TIME - RECORDED (OR.5814.326. / 2020140025)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (OR.5809.319. / 2020135509)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER WITH JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER DATED SEPTEMBER 24 2020 RECEIVED FROM ISBEL LAW PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (OR.5799.2298. / 2020128256)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDERS SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 6/1/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018053864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/31/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000379 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISBEL ESQ, CHRISTOPHER C