This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 17:10:32 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: MCCUMBEE, LINDA

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 THE ESTATE OF MCCUMBEE, LINDA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 PR

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

BOWMAN, TRACEY

GRIFFITH, JASON

GRIFFITH, HALEY CATHERINE

REDDEN, DANIELLA DIANE

WHITE, SILAS WILLIAM

BOWMAN, EVAN

BOWMAN, RYAN

BOWMAN, JULIA

ROANE, PARKER

ROANE, MALLORY

CARLISLE, BEN

CARLISLE, ZACH

CARLISLE, EMILY

HIXON, PATRICIA

MCCUMBEE, CECIL III

LUCAS, GARY

MARLOWE, JUDITH

FITZGERALD, LINDA

VELOSE, GEORGE

Decedent

MCCUMBEE, LINDA

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRICK, JUSTIN M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY/CONSENT TO DISCHARGE. SIGNED BY: LISA WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY/CONSENT TO DISCHARGE. SIGNED BY: LISA WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - RECORDED (OR.6247.1291. / 2022105432)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.6247.1289. / 2022105430)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL RERESENTATIVE SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON THIS DATE 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - RECORDED (OR.6247.1318. / 2022105445)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: LETTER BY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022056839; Applied Amount: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE REGARDING ORIGINAL WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE OF LINDA MCCUMBEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.6235.1189. / 2022095346)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/14/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 000557 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRICK JUSTIN M