Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 16:28:48 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: MARRERO RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 04/24/2018 THE ESTATE OF MARRERO RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARRERO FLORES, NANCY

Decedent

MARRERO RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVILA, LUIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - FL EMERG PHYSICIANS KANG & ASSOC - $1427.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDERS SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 5/1/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2018041826

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/26/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000293 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVILA, LUIS