Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 01:02:32 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: HOLLAND, DANIEL TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 THE ESTATE OF HOLLAND, DANIEL TIMOTHY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 PR

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOLLAND, VIRGINIA

Decedent

HOLLAND, DANIEL TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BLACK, A. CLIFTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION; Judge: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H; Location: COURTROOM 5E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO CONVERT ADMINISTRATION TO SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALLOW DISTRIBUTION AND CLOSE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED, UNCLAIMED-SENT TO ATTORNEY TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/NOTICE OF HEARING (BLANK ORDER) - RECORDED (OR.5685.2740. / 2020031949)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION SET FOR 05/15/2020 AT 11:00 AM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM-FL EMERG PHYSICIANS KANG AND ASSOCIATES MD INC.-$1,498.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM- OSCEOLA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER C/O PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS, LLC $93.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM- POINCIANA MEDICAL CENTER C/O PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS, LLC $5,875.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018050898

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/22/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000360 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITH THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACK , ARTHUR CLIFTON