Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 14:09:26 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: HODGE, HENRY ADAM JR

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 THE ESTATE OF HODGE, HENRY ADAM JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

KANAGA, CHRISTINA

HENRY A. HODGE, JR REVOCABLE TRUST DATED JUNE 4, 2015

Decedent

HODGE, HENRY ADAM JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVEY, CATHERINE PA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.5497.453. / 2019037989)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET (APPROVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE WITH JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE- CHRISTINA C. KANAGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: AUTHENTICATED COPIES DOMICILARY PROCEEDINGS (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED ANCILLAR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018039703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/19/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000278 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: AUTHENTICATED COPIES DOMICILARY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - CHRISTINA KANAGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVEY CATHERINE E