Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 04:38:34 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: HAWLIK, JUSTIN CHARLES III

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 THE ESTATE OF HAWLIK, JUSTIN CHARLES III was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 PR

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

MUSKER, AMY L

Not Yet Classified

HAWLIK, MEG

MUSKER, AMY L

Decedent

HAWLIK, JUSTIN CHARLES III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEWIS, C. D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $12.00 RECEIPT #2018030530

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER W/ JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018028796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/20/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000209 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS, C. D.