Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 10:30:23 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: HANSEN, STEVEN MARION

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 THE ESTATE OF HANSEN, STEVEN MARION was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

PIETRZAK, DAWN

MCGUIRE, VALERIE

HANSEN, ANGELA

Decedent

HANSEN, STEVEN MARION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZOECKLEIN, BRICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: (COPY) REFUND CHECK - ZOECKLEIN LAW, P.A. - $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2020057303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: .P2 WAIVED $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT # 2018034881 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST SENT TO ACCOUNTING VIA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION TO CLOSE DUPLICATE FILE AND REIMBURSE FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM ZOECKLEIN LAW DATED 6/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO CLOSE DUPLICATE FILE AND REIMBURE FILING FEES (NO ORDER PROVIDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018034881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/06/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000252 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOECKLEIN BRICE