Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 10:19:52 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: GRAY, ELIZABETH K

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 THE ESTATE OF GRAY, ELIZABETH K was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

GRAY, GARRETT N

GRAY, CHARLES D

Decedent

GRAY, ELIZABETH K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUONG, LONG H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM- ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC ON BEHALF OF COMENITY CAPITAL BANK- LENDING CLUB PATIENT SOLUTIONS $2,166.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM-CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)- $3,308.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.5463.280. / 2019005797)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET (APPROVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 1/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS (FILED IWTH ATTACHED NOTICE TO CREDITORS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF BOND BY AN INTERESTED PARTY - GARRETT N. GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - CHARLES D. GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - GARRETT N. GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - CHARLES D. GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION WAIVE BOND/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG H DUONG