Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 06:58:10 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: GRAHAM, WILLIAM T

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 THE ESTATE OF GRAHAM, WILLIAM T was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 PR

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DELLEVENIRI, MICHAEL T

GRAHAM, GARY

Decedent

GRAHAM, WILLIAM T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

MASSEY, LEE H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.5509.480. / 2019048876)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET (APPROVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 4/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2018117493

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE. SIGNED BY: RUTH GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: RENUNCIATION OF CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES' COMMISSION. SIGNED BY: GARY GRATHAM AND MICHAEL DELLIVENIRI

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: COPY OF RECEIPT OF WILL FOR SAFEKEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: RENUNCIATION OF RIGHT TO ACT AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF CO-PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND. SIGNED BY: RUTH GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASSEY, LEE H