Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 05:00:14 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: GONZALEZ, CARMEN

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 THE ESTATE OF GONZALEZ, CARMEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 PR

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

AMITRANO, YESENIA

Not Yet Classified

VELEZ, GERMAN

AMITRANO, YESENIA

GONZALEZ, DANIEL

Decedent

GONZALEZ, CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TOWNSEND, NATHAN L ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2020016127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $18.00 RECEIPT #2018054698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING AND ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMIN W/JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - DANIEL GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - GERMAN VELEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL) (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018028851

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/20/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000211 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: LETTER DATED MAY 4, 2017 RE: WILL FOR SAFEKEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOWNSEND , NATHAN LEROY