Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 05:42:01 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: FORD, EVA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 THE ESTATE OF FORD, EVA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 PR

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FORD, GEORGE L J

Not Yet Classified

FORD, GEORGE L S

FORD, KATHLEEN D

FORD, CASSIDY N

FORD, ALLISON M

FORD, AARON S

FORD, DEREK R

CAMPBELL, JORDAN F

Decedent

FORD, EVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CUMBIE, FRED H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.5742.1268. / 2020080798)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISCHARGE WITH JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PROTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE-ALLISONM FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2020048409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE-DEREK FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE- KATHLEEN D FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE-AARON S FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND- GEORGE L FORD, SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.5651.2117. / 2020000720)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: DECLINATION OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF EVA LOUISE FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CP 000004 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMBIE, FRED H