Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 17:24:42 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: ENRIQUEZ, RAMONA

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 THE ESTATE OF ENRIQUEZ, RAMONA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

ENRIQUEZ, ANTONIA

Decedent

ENRIQUEZ, RAMONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DURAN, FABIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2019001823

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL ESTATE - RECORDED (OR.5435.2250. / 2018170601)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.5435.2253. / 2018170602)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDERS SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: SPOKE WITH PATRICIO, WILL SEND CERTIFICATE OF DEATH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2018042482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/27/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000308 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURAN, FABIO