Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 10:10:14 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: DESJARLAIS, OMER R

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 THE ESTATE OF DESJARLAIS, OMER R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOITEAU, PAULETTE

Decedent

DESJARLAIS, OMER R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MASSEY, LEE H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2018084008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDERS SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 8/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: RENUNCIATION OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT SAFE KEEPING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASSEY, LEE H