Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/20/2020 at 09:57:59 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: BLAKES, LEOLA

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 THE ESTATE OF BLAKES, LEOLA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MURPHY, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 PR

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MURPHY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

GORDIAN, CHANTEL

Not Yet Classified

BLAKES, ALONZO

GORDIAN, CHANTEL

BLAKES, OTIS

BLAKES, TERRENCE

Decedent

BLAKES, LEOLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUGAY, SCOTT R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROBATE CLOSING WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO THE JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON 6/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT - CHANTEL GORDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT - ALONZO BLAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PAYMENT - MR. TERRENCE BLAKES AND MR. OTIS BLAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION - RECORDED (OR.5462.498. / 2019004841)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: COURT CLERK NOTES: ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION WITH JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER AND CONSENT OF APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - ALONZO BLAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER AND CONSENT OF APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - OTIS BLAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER AND CONSENT OF APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - LEOLA BLAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER AND CONSENT OF APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - OTIS BLAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018034474

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/04/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CP 000245 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION WAIVE BOND/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bugay, Scott R