Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 05/24/2021 at 17:16:03 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: BETITA, MARIO J J

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 THE ESTATE OF BETITA, MARIO J J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 PR

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KITAMURA, TAICHI

Not Yet Classified

BETITA, SOPHIA M

BETITA, SABRINA MARIE

BETITA, ANABELLE M

Decedent

BETITA, MARIO J J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GLASSER, EVAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER FROM GREENSPOON MARDER- DATED 4/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021028426; Applied Amount: $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2021028426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CP 000249 PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.5920.489. / 2021044547)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Glasser