This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 01/30/2021 at 01:45:33 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK, vs. OQUENDO LORENZANA, GRISELLE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2015 THE BANK OF NEW YORK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OQUENDO LORENZANA, GRISELLE. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POLODNA, SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 MF

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POLODNA, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK,

Defendants

CORREA, GERARDO ARISTUO

OQUENDO LORENZANA, GRISELLE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN TENANT 3

WYNDHAM PALMS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC

WYNDHAM PALMS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

UNKNOWN TENANT 4

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON, KAREN A.

Defendant Attorney

WAHL, HANS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (FORWARDED TO SHERIFF WITH $90 CHECK)

12/15/2015: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (FORWARDED TO SHERIFF WITH $90 CHECK)

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2015151551

12/2/2015: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2015151551

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

10/28/2015: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

10/28/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

10/15/2015: CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL)

SALE SHEET

10/15/2015: SALE SHEET

ENTRY OF DEFAULT- 05/28- DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA; GERARDO ARISTUO CORREA

5/27/2015: ENTRY OF DEFAULT- 05/28- DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA; GERARDO ARISTUO CORREA

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT / UNKNOWN TENANTS

5/11/2015: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT / UNKNOWN TENANTS

PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT (NO ORDER)

5/11/2015: PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT (NO ORDER)

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

3/27/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR GERARDO ARISTUO CORREA

3/27/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR GERARDO ARISTUO CORREA

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA

3/27/2015: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR GRISELLE OQUENDO LORENZANA

NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 5/4/15 (COPY OF NOTICE & COMPLAINT MAILED TO EACH DEFENDANT AS LISTED)

3/27/2015: NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 5/4/15 (COPY OF NOTICE & COMPLAINT MAILED TO EACH DEFENDANT AS LISTED)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

3/24/2015: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

DEFENDANT WYNDHAM PALMS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/9/2015: DEFENDANT WYNDHAM PALMS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

2/26/2015: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

2/25/2015: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

FORM A

2/25/2015: FORM A

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 12/16/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (FORWARDED TO SHERIFF WITH $90 CHECK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (NO WRIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2015151551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketEntry: LETTER RETURNING DOC STAMP CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $990.00 RECEIPT #2015027013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ( EAMILED TO ATTY )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/24/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CA 000480 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYNDHAM PALMS MASTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wahl, Hans Christopher