This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:45:17 (UTC).

TEZEN, IELIANA R vs TEZEN, MARTIN R

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 TEZEN, IELIANA R filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TEZEN, MARTIN R. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Z WIKSTROM, ARVE A, KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S and Z HALKER-SIMPSON, JANIS M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 DC

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Z WIKSTROM, ARVE A

KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S

Z HALKER-SIMPSON, JANIS M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TEZEN, IELIANA R

Respondent

TEZEN, MARTIN R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCCLELLAN, WILLIAM J. ESQ

Respondent Attorneys

CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

KOMARA, KENNETH J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO ENFORCE FINAL JUDGMENT; Judge: KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S; Location: VIRTUAL HEARING; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.5844.2171. / 2020164692)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: VITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO ENFORCE FINAL JUDGMENT SET FOR 12/09/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN VR BEFORE JUDGE: KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL; Judge: KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S; Location: COURTROOM 4D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2020084760

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR IELIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 DR 000008 DC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOMARA, KENNETH J