This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/05/2021 at 11:36:05 (UTC).

TERRELL, STEVEN vs. COPEN HAVER, OTIS LEE

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 TERRELL, STEVEN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against COPEN HAVER, OTIS LEE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 EV

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRELL, STEVEN

Defendant

COPEN HAVER, OTIS LEE

 

Court Documents

LANDLORD/TENANT EVICTION STIPULATION \ ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF THE LANDLORD/TENANT STIPULATION AGREEMENT - RECORDED (OR.5503.884. / 2019043228)

3/22/2019: LANDLORD/TENANT EVICTION STIPULATION \ ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF THE LANDLORD/TENANT STIPULATION AGREEMENT - RECORDED (OR.5503.884. / 2019043228)

PAYMENT $4.15 RECEIPT #2019029591

3/21/2019: PAYMENT $4.15 RECEIPT #2019029591

PAYMENT $138.47 RECEIPT #2019029590

3/21/2019: PAYMENT $138.47 RECEIPT #2019029590

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/14/19 PARTY SERVED: OTIS LEE COPENHAVER

3/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/14/19 PARTY SERVED: OTIS LEE COPENHAVER

PAYMENT $142.62 RECEIPT #2019023880 (ONE WEEK PAYMENT TO 3/14/19)

3/7/2019: PAYMENT $142.62 RECEIPT #2019023880 (ONE WEEK PAYMENT TO 3/14/19)

PAYMENT $2,076.94 RECEIPT #2019017729

2/20/2019: PAYMENT $2,076.94 RECEIPT #2019017729

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

2/11/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

5/14/2019: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

4/18/2019: CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

PAYMENT $142.62 RECEIPT #2019026630 (ONE WEEK PAYMENT 3/14/19 TO 3/21/19)

3/14/2019: PAYMENT $142.62 RECEIPT #2019026630 (ONE WEEK PAYMENT 3/14/19 TO 3/21/19)

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

3/4/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

PAYMENT $4.15 RECEIPT #2019020528

2/28/2019: PAYMENT $4.15 RECEIPT #2019020528

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/27/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER ON DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT (GRANTED)

2/27/2019: ORDER ON DEF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT (GRANTED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/11/2019: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

2/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF COURT (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • HearingEvent: MEDIATION-LANDLORD/TENANT; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: LANDLORD/TENANT EVICTION STIPULATION \ ORDER AFTER REVIEW OF THE LANDLORD/TENANT STIPULATION AGREEMENT - RECORDED (OR.5503.884. / 2019043228)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $4.15 RECEIPT #2019029591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $138.47 RECEIPT #2019029590

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $2,076.94 RECEIPT #2019017729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019014486

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/11/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000460 EV

    Read MoreRead Less