This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 02:30:47 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA vs. SHIRLEY AGUDELO

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHIRLEY AGUDELO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SP

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

Defendant

SHIRLEY AGUDELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

9/27/2018: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

7/26/2018: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

7/23/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

AMENDED ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

7/20/2018: AMENDED ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

7/19/2018: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018062682

6/27/2018: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2018062682

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED (VIC)

6/27/2018: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH ATTACHMENTS ISSUED (VIC)

NOTICE OF FILING SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

12/5/2017: NOTICE OF FILING SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

12/5/2017: MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/24/2017: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

8/31/2017: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017086231

8/31/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017086231

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

8/29/2017: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR SHIRLEY AGUDELO

6/7/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR SHIRLEY AGUDELO

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017049222

5/15/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017049222

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

5/12/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/11/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY

5/11/2017: NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO INTERESTED PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, RETURNED, SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR SHIRLEY AGUDELO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017049222

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED SHIRLEY AGUDELO (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 06/20/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NEW LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 1,159.63 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/11/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 002028 SP

    Read MoreRead Less