This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/05/2021 at 13:35:42 (UTC).

SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC vs. STOFFEL, RONALD A

Case Summary

On 12/04/2015 SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against STOFFEL, RONALD A. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 CL

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

STOFFEL, RONALD A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD A. STOFFEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, JARED

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

3/27/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/28/15 PARTY SERVED: RONALD A STOFFEL

1/4/2016: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/28/15 PARTY SERVED: RONALD A STOFFEL

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD A STOFFEL

1/4/2016: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD A STOFFEL

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

12/8/2015: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

12/8/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2015153401

12/7/2015: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2015153401

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/4/2015: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/4/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/4/2015: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/4/2015: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/28/15 PARTY SERVED: RONALD A STOFFEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONALD A STOFFEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2015153401

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: LIEN FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/04/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CC 002203 CL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Block, Jared, ESQ.