This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 11/21/2020 at 17:01:18 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, vs. KURTZ, KRISTEN

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KURTZ, KRISTEN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY,

A/S/O KRISTY MARICHAL

AND KRISTY MARICHAL INDIVIDUALLY

Defendants

KURTZ, KRISTEN

KURTZ, KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 9/23/2020 PARTY SERVED: KATHLEEN KURTZ

9/25/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 9/23/2020 PARTY SERVED: KATHLEEN KURTZ

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 9/23/2020 PARTY SERVED: KRISTEN KURTZ

9/25/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 9/23/2020 PARTY SERVED: KRISTEN KURTZ

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/21/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2020072614

9/17/2020: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2020072614

PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

9/15/2020: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

9/15/2020: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

$ 3390.82 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/15/2020: $ 3390.82 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/15/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 9/23/2020 PARTY SERVED: KATHLEEN KURTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 9/23/2020 PARTY SERVED: KRISTEN KURTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2020072614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/16/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003704 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 3390.82 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less