This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 20:28:55 (UTC).

SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS, LLC vs. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE and EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SP

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGBOK COLLECTIONS, LLC

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMORGINOS, SEAN M. ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

STEPHENS, JONATHON WESLEY

MCLEAN, DILLON KATE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

10/5/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/14/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR THE DEPOSITION OF THE INSURED

6/26/2019: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR THE DEPOSITION OF THE INSURED

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DESIGNATED SERVICE E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/11/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DESIGNATED SERVICE E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

DEFENDANT'S GEICO'S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

4/23/2018: DEFENDANT'S GEICO'S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION

3/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

1/9/2018: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

11/9/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

11/9/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

11/9/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/9/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

10/26/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/26/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/6/2017: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017082701

8/22/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017082701

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/20/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/20/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR THE DEPOSITION OF THE INSURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE BURDEN OF PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE BURDEN OF PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE BURDEN OF PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DESIGNATED SERVICE E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017082701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 10/06/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/21/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 003263 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 63.60 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less