This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 15:06:14 (UTC).

S.PR ENTERPRISES GROUP INC. D/B/A PRIORITY MOBILE GLASS A/A/O TUTKO ELECTRIC vs. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 S PR ENTERPRISES GROUP INC D/B/A PRIORITY MOBILE GLASS A/A/O TUTKO ELECTRIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.PR ENTERPRISES GROUP INC. D/B/A PRIORITY MOBILE GLASS A/A/O TUTKO ELECTRIC

Defendant

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS, JACK WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020074902

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020074902

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

9/22/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/22/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESSES

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

9/22/2020: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

$2500.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/22/2020: $2500.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/22/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020074902

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 SC 003800 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $2500.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less