This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 08/06/2021 at 17:08:34 (UTC).

SMITH YANNO, MEMORY vs YANNO, JEFFREY

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 SMITH YANNO, MEMORY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against YANNO, JEFFREY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 DS

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH YANNO, MEMORY

Respondent

YANNO, JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOSTICK, NATASHA P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021051551; Applied Amount: $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR MEMORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $397.50 RECEIPT #2021051551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 002119 DS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTICK, NATASHA P