This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:18:39 (UTC).

SHECHTMAN, SUSAN vs CORREA, ANDRES

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 SHECHTMAN, SUSAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CORREA, ANDRES. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Z BROWN, STEEN and KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 PA

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Z BROWN, STEEN

KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHECHTMAN, SUSAN

Respondent

CORREA, ANDRES

Not Yet Classified

MARTIN LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTIN, ANTONIO G

Respondent Attorneys

CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

KOMARA, KENNETH J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $295.15 RECEIPT #2020076537

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL(SEND TO FAMILY INTAKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILIBILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATOR REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • HearingEvent: MEDIATION-FAMILY; Judge: Z BROWN, STEEN; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: IMPASSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING (CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #2019052605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT FOR MEDIATION FOR ANDRES

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR SUSAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/26/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 DR 004080 PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVICES FROM THE CASE MANAGEMENT UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Antonio Giovonnie