This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 22:56:30 (UTC).

SEEKNAY, LLC vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 SEEKNAY, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SP

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEEKNAY, LLC

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN, BRUCE H ESQ

Defendant Attorney

TROWELL, LINDSEY R

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AT PRE-TRIAL/ MEDIATION) / (10/10/17) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

10/6/2017: JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AT PRE-TRIAL/ MEDIATION) / (10/10/17) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - GEICO GENERAL INS CO

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - GEICO GENERAL INS CO

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

10/3/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/3/2017: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/3/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017086104

8/31/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017086104

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

8/30/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/26/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/26/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 100.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

8/26/2017: $ 100.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS' MOTOION TO DISMISS AND/OR STAY AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AT PRE-TRIAL/ MEDIATION) / (10/10/17) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - GEICO GENERAL INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017086104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 10/06/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/28/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 003615 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 100.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less