This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 14:08:43 (UTC).

SEEKNAY LLC vs. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 SEEKNAY LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SP

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEEKNAY LLC

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMORGINOS, SEAN M. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

TROWELL, LINDSEY R

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

1/30/2018: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATATORIES TO DEFENDANT

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

12/31/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/31/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

12/31/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

12/31/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/20/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017093583

9/27/2017: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017093583

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/25/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/18/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/18/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

$ 435.23 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9/18/2017: $ 435.23 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017093583

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 11/03/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/19/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 004071 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 435.23 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less